open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-01140
    Party Name:Leatherwood v. Braggs
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Response]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Previous Cases]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109031
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =