open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-01141
    Party Name:Williams Grocery Inc v. Perdue
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Closing Order]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109030
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =