open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:19-12486-R
    Party Name:Andrew Glenn Davis and Jennifer Elaine Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Objection]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing ]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Schedule(s)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Pre-Confirmation Certification - DSO]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Verification of Creditor List]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Financial Management Course Certification]
    Date Published:January 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor - BNC or USPS Undeliverable Notice]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Payment Advices Certification]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Eck, Lonnie D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.oknb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?150039
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =