open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:20-10461
    Party Name:Capstone Oilfield Disposal Services. LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [miscellaneous relief]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Docket - bk]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employ Professional]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Held (trustee)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Reduce Time]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [General Order 20-5 - Amended]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [General Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry Satisfied]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice to Set Meeting (chp 11 & 13) (multi)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Date of 341 Hearing (chp 11 & 13) (multi)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Verify Case - Chapter 11 Non-Individual]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Signature Block - Incomplete / Incorrect]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [COS]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Bidding Procedures]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Sell]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employ Attorney]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?306150
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =