open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00126
    Party Name:Miller v. Stauffer et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Subpoena]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109628
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =