open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00129
    Party Name:Sullivan et al v. Global 7 Environmental Health & Safety Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Closing Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice from the Court]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109627
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =