open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00128
    Party Name:Betchan et al v. Board of Regents of the University of Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109626
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =