open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00781
    Party Name:JDT Capital LLC v. Fowler et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Notice (other)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?111258
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =