open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00778
    Party Name:Totally Tickets v. Sentinel Insurance Company LTD
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?111252
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =