U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00736
  • Case Name: Willowbrook Resources Inc v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.