U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00739
  • Case Name: Obregon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Certificate]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.