U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00738
  • Case Name: Elizondo v. DIRECTV LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
February, 2022
  • February 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 04, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.