U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00737
  • Case Name: Smith v. McDonough et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 22, 2022: [Transcript Request]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 26, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Objections]
  • January 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 11, 2021: [Objections]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.