U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00729
  • Case Name: Cowherd et al v. SAExploration Seismic Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • July 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Settlement]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 03, 2021: [Supplement]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.