U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00741
  • Case Name: Myers v. Dept of Homeland Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Reopening Case]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 22, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 10, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • September 10, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • September 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 09, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 10, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 02, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.