U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00744
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 02, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • May 02, 2022: [Remand]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 09, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.