U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00743
  • Case Name: Cross v. Clemons et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2021: [Remand]
  • August 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.