U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00745
  • Case Name: Bradshaw v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 22, 2021: [Joint Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 23, 2021: [Certificate]
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.