U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00746
  • Case Name: Bender v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • November 23, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 27, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.