U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00749
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Walmart Stores East LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 04, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 05, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 05, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 05, 2022: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • December 02, 2022: [Objections]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 10, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Quash]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 25, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 22, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 08, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 08, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 05, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Quash]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 25, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 25, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 25, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • July 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 26, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 28, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • July 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.