U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00747
  • Case Name: Kilpatrick v. Central Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 26, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • April 18, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • July 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.