U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00748
  • Case Name: King v. CACI Inc - Federal et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 02, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.