U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00754
  • Case Name: Tyk et al v. Progressive Northern Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 13, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 12, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 29, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • July 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.