U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00751
  • Case Name: Consumer Textile Corp Inc v. Berkley Regional Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 10, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Certificate]
  • July 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.