U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00756
  • Case Name: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company v. Millis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.