U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00761
  • Case Name: Wells v. Galfab LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2021: [Receipt]
  • September 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 30, 2021: [Leave]
  • August 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 03, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.