U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00760
  • Case Name: Rigsby v. Great State of Arkansas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Order and Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 15, 2021: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 18, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 04, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 03, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.