U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00763
  • Case Name: Brown v. McDonough
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 20, 2021: [Objections]
  • October 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.