U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00767
  • Case Name: Hickman v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • April 05, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 05, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 05, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 04, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 04, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.