U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00768
  • Case Name: Red Dot Corporation v. Ward Construction Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 19, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Joint Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 07, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 25, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 24, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.