U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00765
  • Case Name: Professional Value Internet Services LLC v. Central Rural Electric Cooperative
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Receipt]
  • August 04, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.