U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00764
  • Case Name: Njoku v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 11, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 11, 2022: [Docket]
  • February 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 06, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 07, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 05, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.