U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00772
  • Case Name: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Bosquez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 03, 2021: [Strike]
  • September 02, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • September 02, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.