U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00773
  • Case Name: Pankahad v. Diagnostic Laboratory of Oklahoma LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 07, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.