U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00774
  • Case Name: Rogers v. Stephens County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2021: [Supplement]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 06, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.