U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00775
  • Case Name: Smith et al v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • November 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.