U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00778
  • Case Name: iBall Instruments LLC v. Butler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Surreply]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Leave to File Reply]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 13, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 31, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 31, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 31, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 10, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.