U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00782
  • Case Name: Christensen v. Bowen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [USCA - Letter]
  • May 20, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 04, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 30, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2021: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 15, 2021: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • September 10, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2021: [Receipt]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.