U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00783
  • Case Name: Folsom v. Whitten et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2021: [Prisoner IFP Strike]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 10, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.