U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00780
  • Case Name: Zubia et al v. Singh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • July 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.