U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00776
  • Case Name: Anderlohr v. Turn Key Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 05, 2022: [Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 20, 2022: [Special Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [Seal]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 26, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 18, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2021: [Receipt]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.