U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00786
  • Case Name: Epperson v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 09, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
  • August 18, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.