U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00789
  • Case Name: Folsom v. Internal Revenue Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • March 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 11, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 11, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.