U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00788
  • Case Name: Mighty Siren LLC et al v. Bates et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 01, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Entry of Default]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Supplement]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • February 10, 2022: [Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 28, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 11, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.