U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00792
  • Case Name: Hammons v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Receipt]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 12, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.