U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00794
  • Case Name: Scott v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [USCA Order and Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 11, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 07, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 03, 2021: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 12, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.