U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00795
  • Case Name: Flowers v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • March 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Social Security Opening Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • October 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 13, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.