U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00800
  • Case Name: Nilsen et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 26, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • April 19, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 15, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.