U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00802
  • Case Name: South Central Industries v. Kerrtas Marketing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 04, 2022: [Exhibit List]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Witness List]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 08, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 16, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • August 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.