U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00809
  • Case Name: Holtsclaw v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 18, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 02, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.